Go through the Math in Focus Grade 4 Workbook Answer Key Chapter 3 Practice 2 Multiplying by a 2-Digit Number to finish your assignments.

## Math in Focus Grade 4 Chapter 3 Practice 2 Answer Key Multiplying by a 2-Digit Number

Example

15 × 10 = __150__ 63 × 10 = __630__

Question 1.

5 × 60 = 5 × ___ tens

= ____ tens

= ____

Answer:

5 × 60 = 30.

Explanation:

Given that 5 × 60 which is

5 × 60 = 5 ×6 tens

= 3 tens

= 300.

Question 2.

16 × 20 = 16 × ___ tens

= ___ tens

= ___

Answer:

16 × 20 = 320.

Explanation:

Given that 16 × 20 which is

16 × 20 = 16 × 2 tens

= 32 tens

= 320.

Question 3.

33 × 40 = 33 × ___ tens

= ___ tens

= ___

Answer:

33 × 40 = 1320.

Explanation:

Given that 33 × 40 which is

33 × 40 = 33 × 4 tens

= 132 tens

= 1,320.

Question 4.

29 × 30 = 29 × ___ tens

= ___ tens

= ___

Answer:

29 × 30 = 870.

Explanation:

Given that 29 × 30 which is

29 × 30 = 29 × 3 tens

= 87 tens

= 870.

Question 5.

41 × 60 = 41 × ___ × 10

= ___ × 10

= ___

Answer:

41 × 60 = 2,460.

Explanation:

Given that 41 × 60 which is

41 × 60 = 41 × 6 × 10

= 246 × 10

= 2,460.

Question 6.

96 × 40 = 96 × ___ × 4

= ___ × 4

= ___

Answer:

96 × 40 = 3,840.

Explanation:

Given that 96 × 40 which is

96 × 40 = 96 × 10 × 4

= 960 × 4

= 3,840.

Question 7.

618 × 50

= 618 × ___ × 10

= ___ × 10

= ___

Answer:

618 × 50 = 30,900.

Explanation:

Given that 618 × 50 which is

= 618 × 5 × 10

= 3,090 × 10

= 30,900.

Question 8.

752 × 70

= 752 × ___ × 7

= ___ × 7

= ___

Answer:

752 × 70 = 52,640.

Explanation:

Given that 752 × 70 which is

= 752 × 10 × 7

= 7,520 × 7

= 52,640.

What is the French word that has the same meaning as ‘hello’? Match the letters to the products below to find out.

Find each product.

Question 9.

42 × 1o = ________

Answer:

42 × 1o = 420.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 42 × 1o is 420.

Question 10.

786 × 1o = ____

Answer:

786 × 1o = 7,860.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 786 × 1o is 7,860.

Question 11.

16 × 5 = ____

16 × 50 = ___

Answer:

16 × 5 = 80,

16 × 50 = 800.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 16 × 5 is 80 and 16 × 50 is 800.

Question 12.

137 × 6 = ___

137 × 60 = ___

Answer:

137 × 6 = 822,

137 × 60 = 8,220.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 137 × 6 is 822 and 137 × 60 which is 8,220.

Question 13.

23 × 4 = _________

23 × 40 = ___

Answer:

23 × 4 = 92,

23 × 40 = 920.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 23 × 4 is 92 and 23 × 40 which is 920.

Question 14.

405 × 9 = ___

405 × 90 = ___

Answer:

405 × 9 = 3,645,

405 × 90 = 36,450.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 405 × 9 is 3,645 and 405 × 90 which is 36,6450.

Find each product.

Question 15.

70 × 800

7 × 8 = ______

7 × 80 = ______

7 × 800 = _______

So, 700 × 800 = ___

Answer:

7 × 8 = 56,

7 × 80 = 560,

7 × 800 = 5,600,

70 × 800 = 56,000,

700 × 800 = 5,60,000.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 7 × 8 which is 56,so 70 × 800 is 56,000

7 × 80 = 560,

7 × 800 = 5,600,

700 × 800 = 5,60,000.

Question 16.

300 × 90

__________

__________

__________

__________

Answer:

3 × 9 = 27,

3 × 90 = 270,

3 × 900 = 2,700,

30 × 90 = 2,700,

300 × 90 = 27,000.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 300 × 90 which is 27,000. So

3 × 9 = 27,

3 × 90 = 270,

3 × 900 = 2,700,

30 × 90 = 2,700.

Multiply. Find the missing numbers.

Example

Question 17.

Answer:

61 × 86 = 5,246.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 61 × 86 is 5,246.

Question 18.

Answer:

872 × 62 = 54,064.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 872 × 62 is 54,064.

Question 19.

Answer:

709 × 49 = 34,741.

Explanation:

The multiplication of 709 × 49 is 34,741.

Estimate each product. Round each number to its greatest place value.

Example

67 × 35 is about __70__ × __40__.

__70__ × __40__ = 2,800

Question 20.

61 × 86 is about _____ × ___.

__ × __ = ____

Answer:

Actual product is 61 × 86 = 5,246.

Estimated product is 60 × 90 = 5,400.

Explanation:

Given that 61 × 86 which is about 60 × 90,

60 × 90 = 5,400.

Question 21.

872 × 62 is about _____ × ____.

__ × __ = ___

Answer:

Actual product is 872 × 62 = 54,064.

Estimated product is 870 × 60 = 52,200.

Explanation:

Given that 872 × 62 which is about 870 × 60,

870 × 60 = 52,200.

Question 22.

709 × 49 is about ____ × ___.

__ × __ = ___

Answer:

Actual product is 709 × 49 = 34,741.

Estimated product is 710 × 50 = 35,500.

Explanation:

Given that 709 × 49 which is about 710 × 50,

710 × 50 = 35,500.

Multiply. Then estimate to check that your answers are reasonable. Round each number to its greatest place value.

Example

252 is close to 200, So, the answer is reasonable.

Question 23.

48 × 21 = ____

Answer:

Actual product is 48 × 21 = 1,008.

Esstimated product is 50 × 20 = 1,000.

Explanation:

Given that 48 × 21 which is about 50 × 20,

50 × 20 = 1,000.

Question 24.

196 × 34 = ___

Answer:

Actual product is 196 × 34 = 6,664.

Esstimated product is 200 × 30 = 6,000.

Explanation:

Given that 196 × 34 which is about 200 × 30,

200 × 30 = 6,000.

Question 25.

608 × 73 = ___

Answer:

Actual product is 608 × 73 = 44,384.

Esstimated product is 610 × 20 = 12,200.

Explanation:

Given that 608 × 73 which is about 610 × 20,

610 × 20 = 12,200.

Question 26.

721 × 54 = ___

Answer:

Actual product is 721 × 54 = 38,934.

Esstimated product is 720 × 50 = 36,000.

Explanation:

Given that 721 × 54 which is about 720 × 50,

720 × 50 = 36,000.